Statement
|
1.Date of occurrence of the change:2022/06/29
2.Elected or changed position (Please enter institutional director,
institutional supervisor, independent director, natural-person director or
natural-person supervisor):institutional director,institutional supervisor
3.Title and name of the previous position holder:
Directors
(1)Fortune Base Development Corp. Ltd. Representative: Liu, Wei-Long
(2)Global Funeral Service Co. LTD. Representative: Shao, Ming-Bin
(3)Fortune Base Development Corp. Ltd. Representative: Tang, Shun-Zhen
(4)Global Funeral Service Co. LTD. Representative: Liu, Huang-Ji
Independent Director
(1)Young, Gui-Hsiung
(2)Ning, Guo-Hui
(3)Chang, Cheng-Chong
4.Resume of the previous position holder:
Directors
(1)Fortune Base Development Corp. Ltd. Representative: Liu, Wei-Long
LONGBON INTERNATION CO., LTD. Chairman
(2)Global Funeral Service Co. LTD. Representative: Shao, Ming-Bin
FORTUNE BASE DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD. Chairman
(3)Fortune Base Development Corp. Ltd. Representative: Tang, Shun-Zhen
GOBO SERVICE CO., LTD. Chairman
(4)Global Funeral Service Co. LTD. Representative: Liu, Huang-Ji
Director of Zuocheng Law Firm
Independent Director
(1)Young, Gui-Hsiung
Independent Director of LongBon Internation Co., Ltd.
(2)Ning, Guo-Hui
Independent Director of LongBon Internation Co., Ltd.
(3)Chang, Cheng-Chong
Independent Director of LongBon Internation Co., Ltd.
5.Title and name of the new position holder:
Directors
(1)Fortune Base Development Corp. Ltd. Representative: Liu, Wei-Long
(2)Global Funeral Service Co. LTD. Representative: Shao, Ming-Bin
(3)Fortune Base Development Corp. Ltd. Representative: Tang, Shun-Zhen
(4)Global Funeral Service Co. LTD. Representative: Liu, Huang-Ji
Independent Director
(1)Young, Gui-Hsiung
(2)Chen, Yun-Jin
(3)Xu, Pei-Ling
6.Resume of the new position holder:
Directors
(1)Fortune Base Development Corp. Ltd. Representative: Liu, Wei-Long
LONGBON INTERNATION CO., LTD. Chairman
(2)Global Funeral Service Co. LTD. Representative: Shao, Ming-Bin
FORTUNE BASE DEVELOPMENT CO., LTD. Chairman
(3)Fortune Base Development Corp. Ltd. Representative: Tang, Shun-Zhen
GOBO SERVICE CO., LTD. Chairman
(4)Global Funeral Service Co. LTD. Representative: Liu, Huang-Ji
Director of Zuocheng Law Firm
Independent Director
(1)Young, Gui-Hsiung
Independent Director of LongBon Internation Co., Ltd.
(2)Chen, Yun-Jin
Independent Director, Shin Kong Commercial Bank Co., LTD
(3)Xu, Pei-Ling
CTBC Business School Director of Technology Finance Institute
7.Circumstances of change (Please enter "resignation", "dismissal",
"term expired", "death" or "new appointment"):term expired
8.Reason for the change:re-election in advance
9.Number of shares held by the new position holder when elected:
Directors
(1)Fortune Base Development Corp. Ltd. ;58,364,520
Representative: Liu, Wei-Long
(2)Global Funeral Service Co. LTD. ;69,889,080
Representative: Shao, Ming-Bin
(3)Fortune Base Development Corp. Ltd. ;58,364,520
Representative: Tang, Shun-Zhen
(4)Global Funeral Service Co. LTD.;69,889,080
Representative: Liu, Huang-Ji
Independent Director
(1)Young, Gui-Hsiung ;0
(2)Chen, Yun-Jin;0
(3)(Xu, Pei-Ling;0
10.Original term (from __________ to __________):
2019/06/27~2022/06/26
11.Effective date of the new appointment:2022/06/29~2025/06/28
12.Turnover rate of directors of the same term:N/A
13.Turnover rate of independent directors of the same term:N/A
14.Turnover rate of supervisors of the same term:N/A
15.Change in one-third or more of directors (Please enter "Yes" or
"No"):No
16.Any other matters that need to be specified:None
|